CA AB1438 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 100825, 100829, 100837, 100840, 100847, 100850, 100851, 100852, 100862, 100865, 100870, 100872, 100875, 100880, 100885, 100890, 100895, 100907, 116271, 116425, 116540, 116625, 116700, and 116701 of, to add Section 100920.5 to, and to repeal and add Sections 100855, 100910, and 100915 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 21080.26 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the State Water Resources Control Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Water Resources Control Board: environmental laboratories: public water systems: certificates and permits: procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1438 E.S. & T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1395.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code100825Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100829Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100837Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100840Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100847Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100850Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100851Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100852Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100862Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100865Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100870Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100872Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100875Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100880Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100885Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100890Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100895Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100907Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code100920.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code116271Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116425Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116540Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116625Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116700Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116701Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21080.26Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback