CA AB1438 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 152.3 of the Penal Code, relating to child abuse reporting.
Title
Child abuse reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Assembly - AB 1438 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-04-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4337.) | |
2012-03-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 28). | |
2012-03-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-08 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 6). | |
2012-01-24 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-01-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-01-05 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. | |
2012-01-04 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11166 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 152.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |