CA AB1437 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 19750) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 337a of the Penal Code, relating to gambling, and making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Gambling: Internet Fantasy Sports Game Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1437 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 3500.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (January 6). |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19750 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19954 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |