CA AB1436 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 4980.396, 4989.23, 4996.27, and 4999.66 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Board of Behavioral Sciences: licensees: suicide prevention training.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1436 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1436 Levine et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1436 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1436 Levine et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1436 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6879.). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 28). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5440.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 1654.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 10). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4980.396 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 1680 | Amended Code | Citation Text |