CA AB1435 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4023.2 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The State Department of State Hospitals: investigations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1435 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2097.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4023.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4023.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback