CA AB1435 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25214.14 and 25214.15 of, and to add Section 25214.25 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: toxics: packaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1435 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1435 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1592.) |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25214.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25214.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25214.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25214.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |