CA AB1434 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10609.4 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban water use objectives: indoor residential water use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2022-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2022-01-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2021-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 6.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code10609.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback