CA AB1434 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 9 @ 1:30 pm Assembly Human Services Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12201 of, and to add Section 12200.7 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public social services: SSI/SSP.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12200.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12201Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback