CA AB1432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 351 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water shortage emergencies: declarations: wildfires.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1432 Dahle Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.)
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code10609.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code351Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback