CA AB143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 336, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 336, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8698.4 of the Government Code, relating to housing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Shelter crisis: homeless shelters: Counties of Alameda and Orange: City of San Jose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 143 Quirk-Silva Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB143 Quirk-Silva et al. By Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 143 Quirk-Silva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB143 Quirk-Silva et al. By Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 143 Quirk-Silva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 336, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3150.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2577.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 4). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and EQ. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2018-12-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 13. |
2018-12-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8698.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |