CA AB1425 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 281 of, and to add Section 281.4 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
California Advanced Services Fund: Broadband Public Housing Account.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1425 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1425 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1900.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 281.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |