CA AB1422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26003 and 26011.8 of the Public Resources Code, and to repeal Section 1 of Chapter 677 of the Statutes of 2012, relating to energy.
Title
California Alternative Energy and Advanced
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1422 J., E.D.& E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PEREZ, V.M (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1422 Committee on Jobs, Economic Devel By Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1422 J., E.D.& E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1422 Committee on Jobs, Economic Devel By Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1422 J., E.D.& E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3127.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2229.). |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U., & C. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1479.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. |
2013-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 21. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26011.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |