CA AB1420 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26180 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: licensing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1420 Obernolte Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
2019-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-06-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1766.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26180Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback