CA AB1420 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1917.1, 2028.5, and 12104 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1727 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 19849.11 and 22959.6 of the Government Code, to amend Section 25722.8 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 8352.4 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 4024, 11462, and 14701 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: state agencies: reports.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] |
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] | Asm. Curt Hagman [R] | Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] |
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1420A& A.R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1420 Committee on ACC. & ADM. REV. (Fr (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1420A& A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1420 Committee on ACC. & ADM. REV. (Fr (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1420A& A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2586.). |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1844.). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1579.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 21. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |