CA AB1416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 303, 9050, 9051, 9053, and 13282 of, and to add Section 9170 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: ballot label.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1416 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1416 Santiago et al. By Stern (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 1416 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1416 Santiago Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2022.
2022-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2022-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2022-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 17.).
2022-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2022-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12.).
2022-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2022-08-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-08-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
2022-08-02SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2022-06-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-06-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 21).
2022-05-04SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2022-02-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2022-01-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 3427.)
2022-01-27AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 3397.)
2022-01-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code13282Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code303Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9050Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9051Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9053Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9170New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416#92CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB1416

Bill Comments

feedback