CA AB1416 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1798.145 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business: collection and disclosures of consumer personal information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1416 Cooley Assembly Third Reading By DALY (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 17. Page 2127.)
2019-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.145Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback