CA AB1411 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 13113.95 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection.
Title
Fire protection: type 1 clothes dryers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Assembly - AB 1411 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1411 Eduardo Garcia By McGuire (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1411 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1411 Eduardo Garcia By McGuire (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1411 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 2834.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2372.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 1883.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 13113.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |