CA AB1410 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 858, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 858, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4515 of, and to add Sections 4739 and 5875 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1410 Rodriguez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1410 Rodriguez By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 1410 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1410 Rodriguez By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 1410 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 858, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5184.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 3424.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (January 13). |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to com. on JUD.) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3242.) |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4739 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 5875 | New Code | See Bill Text |