CA AB1410 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 15.5 (commencing with Section 44410) to Chapter 2 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers: Computer Science Access Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1410 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2097.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 27).
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44410New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback