CA AB141 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8208, 8210, 8211, 8281.5, 14002, 32526, 41404.5, 41585, 42238.024, 44042.5, 46120, 46393, 48000.15, 48648, 48649, 48650, 51225.31, 52052, 52064.1, and 52202 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 144 and 148 of Chapter 44 of the Statutes of 2021, to amend Sections 124 and 137 of Chapter 52 of the Statutes of 2022, and to amend Sections 112, 115, and 121 of Chapter 48 of the Statutes of 2023, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: education omnibus budget trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 141 Budget Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-13SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2023-08-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-08-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-04-12SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-03-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 849.)
2023-03-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-20AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2023-03-20AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2023-03-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.)
2023-02-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-02-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2023-01-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2023-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code14002Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32526Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41404.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41585Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.024Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44042.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code46120Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code46393Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48000.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48648Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48649Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48650Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51225.31Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52052Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52064.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52202Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8208Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8210Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8211Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8281.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback