CA AB141 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 611, 613, and 1209 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 166, 1122, and 1128 of the Penal Code, relating to jurors.
Title
Jurors: electronic communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB141 Fuentes (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 141 FUENTES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 141 FUENTES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-25 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1864.). | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-07 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |
2011-04-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 981.) | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-15 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-01-14 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | |
2011-01-13 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 613 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 166 | Amended Code | Citation Text |