CA AB1409 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 270 and 280.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Teleconnect Fund Administrative Committee Fund: Digital Divide Grant Program: homework gap projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code270Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code280.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback