CA AB1408 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3003, 3041, 3454, and 3455 of the Penal Code, relating to supervised release.
Title
Crimes: supervised release.
Sponsors
Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1408 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1408 Calderon et al. By Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1408 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1408 Calderon et al. By Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1408 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3319.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2772.). |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1842.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |