CA AB1407 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2786 and 2811.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 123630.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurses: implicit bias courses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1407 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1407 Burke et al. By Bradford (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1407 Burke Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-01 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1.).
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 14).
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-06-03SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
2021-05-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 19).
2021-05-04AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2786Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2811.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code123630.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback