CA AB1407 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23103, 23109, and 23109.2 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reckless driving: speed contests: vehicle impoundment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1407 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1407 Friedman By Umberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1407 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-17AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3158.).
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2571.).
2019-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-27SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-08-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
2019-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1511.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code23103Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23109Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23109.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback