CA AB1407 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1714 of the Civil Code, relating to liability.
Title
Liability: social hosts: alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Asm. Alyson Huber [D] |
Asm. Jared Huffman [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1407 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FEUER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1407 Committee on JUD. (Feuer) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1407 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1407 Committee on JUD. (Feuer) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1407 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-07 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2969.). | |
2011-09-06 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1407.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 6). | |
2011-08-15 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1863.). | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1436.) | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 10). | |
2011-05-03 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 7. | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |