CA AB1406 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 44272.8 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Alternative and Renewable Fuel and Vehicle Technology Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1406 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1406 O'Donnell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1829.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44272.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |