CA AB1406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17403 and 17517 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School facilities: leases of real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 1406 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1406 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1406 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6201.).
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-06-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.).
2018-06-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6).
2018-05-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-14SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-07-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 1919.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17403Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17517Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50897New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback