CA AB1406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17403 and 17517 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: leases of real property.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 1406 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1406 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1406 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1406 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1406 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6201.). |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 1919.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17517 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50897 | New Code | See Bill Text |