CA AB1405 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.6 (commencing with Section 172) to Chapter 1 of Division 1 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Digital sign demonstration pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1405 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1405 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 10). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 2073.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 26). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2847 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 9621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 172 | New Code | See Bill Text |