CA AB1400 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 25620.9 and 25711.8 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Public Interest Research, Development, and Demonstration Program and Electric Program Investment Charge program: microgrid projects: diesel backup generators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1400 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1400 Friedman By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1400 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1400 Friedman By Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1400 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 7. Page 3318.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2767.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 1799.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 24). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 19). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25620.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25711.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |