CA AB1400 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 25200.24 and 25200.25 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste facilities.
Title
Hazardous waste: facilities permitting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1400 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and APPR. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 1839.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1685.) |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25200.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4629.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |