CA AB1400 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 110190 and 110200 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to export documents.
Title
Export documents: expiration.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1400 J., E.D.& E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PEREZ, V.M (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1400 Committee on Jobs, Economic Devel By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1400 J., E.D.& E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1400 Committee on Jobs, Economic Devel By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1400 J., E.D.& E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3124.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2241.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1479.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 11. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 110190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |