CA AB140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 16 (commencing with Section 69820) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Kickstart My Future Loan Forgiveness Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2018-12-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
2018-12-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69820New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback