CA AB14 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 285, 914.7, and 2881 of, and to add Sections 281.1 and 884.2 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications: California Advanced Services Fund: deaf and disabled telecommunications program: surcharges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 14 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB14 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Gonzalez Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 14 Aguiar-Curry Third Reading Urgency (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 7.).
2021-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-09SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8.).
2021-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-13SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2021-07-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 5).
2021-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 7.).
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-04-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and L. GOV.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code281.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code285Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2881Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code884.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code914.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback