CA AB14 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13978.8 to the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
State freight plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB14 Lowenthal By DeSaulnier (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 14 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 14 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1881.). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 1657.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 29). |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. Introduced measure version corrected. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13978.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |