CA AB14 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 22659.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: nuisance abatement: impoundment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 14 FUENTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB14 Fuentes By Padilla (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - AB 14 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - AB 14 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading Amend By FUENTES Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB14 Fuentes By Padilla (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - AB 14 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - AB 14 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading Amend By FUENTES Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3188.) | |
2009-09-03 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 2109.) | |
2009-08-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-06-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 977.) | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 822.). | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |
2009-03-17 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. (Corrected March 16.) | |
2009-03-10 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22659.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |