CA AB1398 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 13.6 (commencing with Section 21200) to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: the Sustainable Environmental
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21200 | New Code | See Bill Text |