CA AB1395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22948.20, 22948.21, and 22948.23 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 35 (commencing with Section 22948.20) of Division 8 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to information privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information privacy: other connected device with a voice recognition feature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback