CA AB1395 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 186.9 of the Penal Code, relating to money laundering.
Title
Money laundering: criminal activity: lotteries and gaming.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1395 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1395 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 3478.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-12-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 17539.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |