CA AB1394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 781.1 to, and to repeal Section 903.3 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: sealing of records.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1394 Daly Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1394 Daly By Umberg (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1394 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1394 Daly By Umberg (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1394 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 3147.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2563.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1520.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 781.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 903.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |