CA AB1394 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26150, 26155, and 26170 of, to add Section 26250 to, and to repeal Section 26202 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: concealed carry licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26202 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26250 | New Code | See Bill Text |