CA AB1393 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23103, 23109, and 23109.2 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Reckless driving: speed contests: vehicle impoundment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1393 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Friedman et al. By Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1393 FRIEDMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Friedman et al. By Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1393 FRIEDMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-04 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3456.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2822.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1395.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23109.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |