CA AB1393 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Personal income taxes: income exclusion: mortgage debt forgiveness.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Assembly - AB 1393 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Perea Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 1393 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Perea Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 1393 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5799.). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4195.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1008.) |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116273 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 127.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 138.65 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 77.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17144.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |