CA AB1393 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4007.5 to the Penal Code, relating to county jails.
Title
Fresno County jails: overcrowding: transfer to
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1393 A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Assembly Third Reading By CAMPOS (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1393 A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Assembly Third Reading By CAMPOS (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-03 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-08-15 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-06-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 8). | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 1465.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Measure version as amended on April 7 corrected. | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and L. & E. | |
2011-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19846.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1308.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4007.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |