CA AB1391 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 51210 and 51223 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: adopted course of study: elementary school: physical education: complaints.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1391 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1391 Gomez By Block (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1391 GOMEZ Third Reading Urgency (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-17AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3008.).
2015-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-09-08SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2587.).
2015-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2015-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1672.).
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2015-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51210Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51223Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1391&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_bill_20150420_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_bill_20150430_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_bill_20150702_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_bill_20150902_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_bill_20150911_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_bill_20151009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150408_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150428_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150601_1236PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150817_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150908_0325PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1351-1400/ab_1391_vote_20150909_0255PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback