CA AB1390 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6373, 6477, 8709, and 8712 of, to add Section 6210.6 to, and to repeal Sections 6201.5 and 6205 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to state lands.
Title
State lands: school and lieu lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1390 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB1390 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1390 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Special Consent AB1390 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1390 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3024.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2491.). |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1720.) (June 29). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1547.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6201.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6205 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6210.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6373 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6477 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 8709 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 8712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |