CA AB139 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 361.2 of, and to add and repeal Section 13282.1 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 139 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 139 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (February 3). |
2022-02-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3. Page 1690.) (June 28). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 481.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13282.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |