CA AB139 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2337 and 2040 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 250, 267, 279, 2580, 5000, 5302, 13111, 13206, and 13562 of, to amend and renumber Sections 5600, 5601, 5602, 5603, and 5604 of, to add Section 69 to, to add the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 5040) to Part 1 of Division 5 of, to add and repeal Part 4 (commencing with Section 5600) of Division 5 of, and to repeal the heading of Part 4 (commencing with Section 5600) of Division 5 of, the Probate Code, relating to nonprobate transfers.
Title
Nonprobate transfers: revocable transfer upon death deeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 139 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB139 Gatto By Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Assembly - AB 139 GATTO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB139 Gatto By Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Assembly - AB 139 GATTO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2729.). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2309.). |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 855.) |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 2040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 2337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 2580 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 267 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 279 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 5000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 5302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 5600 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text |