CA AB1389 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 44272 and 44272.4 of, and to add Section 44272.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative and Renewable Fuel and Vehicle Technology Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1389 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-07SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-06-09SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C., TRANS. and E.Q.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12.)
2021-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 12).
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code44272Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44272.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code44272.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback